U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 26, 2020: [Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY)]
  • June 26, 2020: [Witness List]
  • June 25, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 25, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 23, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • June 23, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 23, 2020: [Unseal Case]
  • June 23, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.