U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02371-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2020: [Strike]
  • November 04, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 04, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 24, 2020: [Detention]
  • July 23, 2020: [Detention]
  • July 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • July 07, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 06, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.