U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Travel]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • September 15, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 15, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2020: [Appear]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.