U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Banks
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 21, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 13, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • July 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • July 13, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 13, 2020: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.