U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02409-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order]
  • December 29, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • November 12, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 04, 2020: [Strike]
  • November 04, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • September 14, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 14, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 16, 2020: [Detention]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 13, 2020: [Unseal Case]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • July 13, 2020: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.