U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02411-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pineda-Caceras
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 10, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • August 06, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 06, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 14, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.