U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-mj-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Witness List]
  • February 01, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • January 28, 2021: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • January 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • January 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • January 27, 2021: [Complaint]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • January 27, 2021: [Seal Case]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • July 15, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 15, 2020: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2020: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order to Seal Case]
  • July 15, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • July 15, 2020: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.