U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02430-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alvarado
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 13, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 12, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 04, 2020: [Strike]
  • November 04, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.