U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02469-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Groves
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 15, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
  • December 09, 2020: [Detention]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 28, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.