U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cano et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 04, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 08, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 04, 2020: [Strike]
  • November 04, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 05, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 05, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 04, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 31, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • August 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • August 29, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 28, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • August 28, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • August 27, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 27, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • August 20, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.