U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02477-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowers
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • September 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order]
  • August 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 06, 2020: [Detention]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 06, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.