U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02471-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mallory
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Speedy Trial]
  • October 23, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2020: [Detention]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 07, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.