open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee
    Case Number:20-23911
    Party Name:William Francis Parker, Jr. and Brandie Marlene Parker
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Request For Notice (Not for Attorney Filer)]
    Date Published:August 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Meeting Of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Tax Returns]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Pay / Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [AutoDocket Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Meeting Of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Matrix]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Form 121 - Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Ch 7 - Form 122A-1 Statement Of Your Monthly Income]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Certificate Of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Voluntary Petition (Ch 7 - Atty Case Opening Only)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.tnwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?537630
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =