open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Tennessee
    Case Number:2:20-bk-51336-
    Party Name:David Blaine Buck, Jr.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Agreed Order]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Certificate of Credit Counseling For Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Statement Regarding Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Debtor Electronic Noticing Election (DeBN)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [SSN Certification]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Payne, Douglas L [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.tneb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?473780
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =