open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee
    Case Number:20-23915
    Party Name:Larhonda Patrice Watkins
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [Statement Continuing Meeting Of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [Trustee's Motion To Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Meeting Of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [BNC Certificate Of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [BNC Certificate Of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [Order Directing Employer To Make Deductions]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [Clerk's Approval of Applic Pay Filing Fee Installments]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [Meeting Of Creditors Ch 13]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [Update Chapter 13 Deficiency Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [Application To Pay Filing Fee In Installments]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [Chapter 13 - Form 122C-1 Statement Of Your Monthly Income]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [Voluntary Petition (Ch 13 - Atty Case Opening Only)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [Matrix]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Brown, Sylvia F. [Form 121 - Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.tnwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?537634
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =