open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee

TENNESSEE PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Tennessee
    Case Number:20-23916
    Party Name:Brittany L Thomas
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Continuance Of Meeting Of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [BNC Certificate Of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Meeting Of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Clerk's Approval of Applic Pay Filing Fee Installments]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Meeting Of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Matrix]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Form 121 - Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Application To Pay Filing Fee In Installments]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Ch 7 - Form 122A-1 Statement Of Your Monthly Income]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Certificate Of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Teems, Lynda F. [Voluntary Petition (Ch 7 - Atty Case Opening Only)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.tnwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?537635
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =