U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02176-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henry
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 19, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 12, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 12, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • August 12, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • August 12, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 12, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.