U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smallwood
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 25, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • August 20, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • August 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2020: [Appear by Video Conference]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order]
  • August 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.