U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-po-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Winebrenner
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 05, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 01, 2020: [Suppress]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.