U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oliva-Hernandez et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 02, 2021: [Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order]
  • February 10, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Revoke]
  • January 14, 2021: [Protective Order]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Compel]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 04, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Produce]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • September 25, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 22, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • September 16, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • September 09, 2020: [Produce]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 29, 2020: [Order]
  • August 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 27, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.