U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 26, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • October 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 04, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 04, 2020: [Order]
  • September 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 02, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 02, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
August, 2020
  • August 29, 2020: [Order]
  • August 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.