U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-01012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watkins
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Release from Custody]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.