U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chambers
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 29, 2020: [Protective Order]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • October 21, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • October 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order]
  • September 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order]
  • September 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 09, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.