U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gersky et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.