U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gholston
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 30, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • February 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 24, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order]
  • February 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2020: [Detention]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.