U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aldridge
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 17, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.