U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 28, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 28, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 28, 2022: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • April 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • April 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2022: [Complaint]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 20, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Detention]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 18, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.