U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bonilla
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Transcript]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • October 08, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2020: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • October 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2020: [Exhibit List (Court Proceedings ONLY)]
  • October 07, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 06, 2020: [Bond ]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 05, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • September 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 29, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.