U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mc-00026
  • Case Name: Raines v. Bureau of Prisons et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 04, 2020: [Mail Returned]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice re IFP Service (Pro Se)]
  • October 20, 2020: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • October 20, 2020: [In Forma Pauperis (Proceed)]
  • October 15, 2020: [Supplement]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address]
  • October 02, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.