U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tate et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • October 08, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 08, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 08, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • October 07, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • October 06, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.