U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McColley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • October 11, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • October 09, 2020: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • October 08, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 08, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 07, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 07, 2020: [Case Sealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.