U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02540-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 05, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 21, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 08, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.