U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mc-00021
  • Case Name: International Union of Painters and Allied Trades, District Counsel 91 v. Clearview Glass and Glazing
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2020
  • December 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 18, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 14, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.