U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02551-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirkpatrick, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2021: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 17, 2020: [Detention]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 19, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.