U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02555-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 20, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 09, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 20, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.