U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02576-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hogan
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 08, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • December 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 12, 2020: [Detention]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.