U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-04114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 12, 2021: [Detention]
  • January 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 30, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.