U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02503-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stokes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Psychiatric Exam ]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order]
  • November 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 05, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • November 04, 2020: [Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.