U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02599-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Radley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 05, 2020: [Detention]
  • November 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 05, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.