U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02623-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Protective Order]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 09, 2020: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • November 06, 2020: [Detention]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 06, 2020: [Unseal Case]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • November 06, 2020: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.