U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hughes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2021: [Detention]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 06, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.