U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-03020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gault
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.