U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lavender
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 18, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 10, 2020: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • November 10, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • November 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • November 10, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.