U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-02627-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zarculia
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • December 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to Indict]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 17, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 12, 2020: [Detention]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 12, 2020: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.