U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01163-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • March 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Order]
  • February 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Detention]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 12, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.