U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cain
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Transcript]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 23, 2020: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • December 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 18, 2020: [Supplement]
  • December 18, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • December 11, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2020: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2020: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • December 07, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • December 07, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.