U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buchanan
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 12, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to Indict]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Detention]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 18, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.