U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00188-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Public Docket Annotation]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • November 23, 2020: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 20, 2020: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2020: [Bond ]
  • November 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • November 19, 2020: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 19, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • November 19, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.