U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tarter
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 01, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Order of Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 17, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 11, 2020: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 11, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • December 11, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 11, 2020: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order Approving Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • December 11, 2020: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Filing]
  • December 11, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.