U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-mj-01175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aichinger
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 07, 2020: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.